WILLIAM HEPTINSTALL MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Trust is to establish an annual award for the study of the culinary arts to be awarded to men or women normally under the age of 30 years who are ordinarily resident in the United Kingdom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 March 1972: Standard registration
- WILLIAM HEPTINSTALL AWARD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LOWRANCE TRUSTEE CO LTD | Trustee | 05 November 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.33k | £4.27k | £3.95k | £6.63k | £8.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.03k | £396 | £431 | £5.08k | £5.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND JANUARY 1972
Charitable objects
THE ESTABLISHMENT OF AN ANNUAL SCHOLARSHIP FOR THE STUDY OF THE CULINARY ARTS TO BE KNOWN AS THE WILLIAM HEPTINSTALL AWARD TO BE AWARDED TO MEN OR WOMEN UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Angus Close
HORSHAM
West Sussex
RH12 2EQ
- Phone:
- 07572 970945
- Website:
-
williamheptinstallaward.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window