THE WALTER JOHNSTONE DOUGLAS MEMORIAL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of scholarships to drama students at schools or colleges approved by the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 December 1973: Standard registration
- 16 August 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £472 | £11.99k | £18 | £77 | £136 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £1.21k | £346 | £764 | £782 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 04 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 04 March 2013 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 21 December 2011 | 51 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 24 November 2010 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1973.
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ART OF SINGING AND/OR THE DRAMATIC ARTS BY MEANS OF A SCHOLARSHIP TO BE CALLED THE "WALTER JOHNSTON DOUGLAS SCHOLARSHIP"; SUCH SCHOLARSHIP TO BE TENABLE AT THE WEBBER DOUGLAS ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART, 30-36 CLAREVILLE STREET, LONDON, SW7 5AW; OR AT SUCH OTHER SCHOOL OR COLLEGE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY APPROVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window