POLICY STUDIES INSTITUTE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PSI is now part of the University of Westminster and will shortly be wound up as a separate charity. Research mainly in the areas of work and social policy and the environment. PSI Research informs policy in areas including work, pensions, unemployment, ethnicity, education, disability, health, age, the environment and sustainable development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Ireland
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- Spain
- United States
Governance
- 15 December 1965: Standard registration
- 29 November 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PSI (Working name)
- POLITICAL AND ECONOMIC PLANNING (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.79m | £4.09m | £2.84m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.96m | £3.95m | £2.72m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £24.14k | £21.50k | £10.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £29.39k | -£10.62k | £2.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.50m | £3.78m | £2.70m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £228.97k | £299.19k | £125.72k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £4.96m | £3.95m | £2.72m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £2.96k | £3.10k | £3.14k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 14 February 2012 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 31 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 20 April 2010 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2008 | 25 September 2009 | 117 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2008 | 27 May 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 NOVEMBER 1963 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 31 MARCH 1978, 27 APRIL 1989 AND 29 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF LEARNING BY RESEARCH INTO THOSE CONSIDERATIONS RELATING TO THE POLITICAL ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL WELL BEING AND QUALITY OF LIFE OF THE COMMUNITY OR ANY SECTION OF IT WHICH IS RELEVANT TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC POLICY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 15 December 1965 : Standard registration
- 29 November 2000 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window