Financial history THE PAUL MELLON CENTRE FOR STUDIES IN BRITISH ART

Charity number: 313838
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £6.48m £5.65m £5.81m £7.25m £7.41m
Total expenditure £5.28m £4.82m £5.49m £6.44m £6.37m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.31m £4.86m £5.48m £6.56m £6.85m
Income - Other trading activities £759.19k £244.23k £274.60k £272.71k £165.26k
Income - Charitable activities £372.89k £536.25k £56.05k £337.25k £210.65k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £40.74k £10.09k £318 £83.94k £163.64k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £215 £24.01k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £5.28m £4.82m £5.49m £6.44m £6.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £88.39k £72.83k £92.99k £125.92k £104.10k
Expenditure - Grants institution £558.35k £391.85k £378.79k £394.41k £452.33k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0