Financial history DAVID AND VERA LEVI MEDICAL RESEARCH MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 313853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.59k £8.06k £9.48k £11.01k £13.09k
Total expenditure £21.15k £7.88k £9.94k £16.49k £19.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A