THE ELDER DEMPSTER GHANA AND NIGERIA INDEPENDENCE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects of the Trust are to provide: 1. Post-graduate scholarships and grants for Ghanaians and Nigerians; 2. Financial assistance for Ghanaian and Nigerian artisans, technicians and engineers; 3. Awards for achievements by Ghanaians and Nigerians; and 4. Assistance in establishing educational schemes, institutions and foundations for the benefit of Ghanaians and Nigerians.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
- Ghana
- Nigeria
Governance
- 18 August 1961: Standard registration
- 28 March 2013: Funds received from 306135 THE ELDER DEMPSTER GHANA INDEPENDENCE TRUST
- THE ELDER DEMPSTER NIGERIA INDEPENDENCE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN DAVID GAVIN LOVE | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
BERTRAND PAUL MARCEL JANNIN | Trustee | 27 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.75k | £19.25k | £19.56k | £16.95k | £19.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.11k | £17.10k | £17.31k | £112.47k | £95.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 JANUARY 1961 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 23 DECEMBER 1996 AND 9 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
(1)TO PROVIDE POST GRADUATE SCHOLARSHIPS AND GRANTS IN AID OF POST-GRADUATE RESEARCH BY GHANAIANS AND NIGERIANS. (2) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE FOR GHANAIAN AND NIGERIAN ARTISANS TECHNICIANS AND ENGINEERS FOLLOWING AN ADVANCED COURSE OF INSTRUCTION IN THEIR TRADE OR PROFESSION. (3) THE PROVISION OF AWARDS FOR ACHIEVEMENTS BY GHANAIANS AND NIGERIANS IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES. (4) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN EDUCATIONAL SCHEMES INSTITUTIONS AND FOUNDATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF GHANAIANS AND NIGERIANS. (5) SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF GHANAIANS AND NIGERIANS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
TLT Solicitors
1 Redcliff Street
BRISTOL
BS1 6TP
- Phone:
- 03330060823
- Email:
- Paula.Williams@TLT.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window