BOOK AID INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Book Aid International is the UK's leading international book donation and library development charity. Book Aid International's vision is a world where everyone has access to the books that will enrich, improve and change their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£22,561,637
Donations and legacies | £3.30m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £8.15k | |
Investments | £16.84k | |
Other | £19.24m |
Total expenditure:
£19,991,642
Raising funds | £756.07k | |
Charitable activities | £1.70m | |
Other | £17.53m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £18.29m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.70m | |
Retained for future use | £2.57m |
People

29 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bhutan
- Cameroon
- Eritrea
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Greece
- Iraq
- Kenya
- Lebanon
- Liberia
- Malawi
- Namibia
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Rwanda
- Saint Vincent
- Sierra Leone
- Somalia
- Sudan
- Syria
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 04 July 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr ALICE MARJORIE SHEILA PROCHASKA | Chair | 01 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Alan James David Hurcombe | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Lee Clarke | Trustee | 27 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Emma Jones | Trustee | 21 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anne Makena | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chioma Michelle Okwudiafor | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hutton | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dhivya O'Connor | Trustee | 09 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Zainab Umar | Trustee | 08 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.28m | £14.81m | £12.57m | £17.70m | £22.56m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.20m | £12.97m | £15.59m | £17.42m | £19.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.25m | £1.89m | £2.54m | £2.25m | £3.30m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.14k | £1.76k | £5 | £10.09k | £8.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £8.30k | £59.42k | £11.96k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £10.27k | £8.55k | £5.32k | £5.42k | £16.84k | |
|
Income - Other | £1.62k | £12.85m | £10.01m | £15.43m | £19.24m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £275.04k | £27.23k | £123.01k | £65.95k | £74.34k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.62m | £1.37m | £1.71m | £1.85m | £1.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £588.96k | £534.72k | £599.44k | £775.88k | £756.07k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £15.48k | £10.81k | £14.74k | £15.41k | £20.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £284.50k | £193.08k | £410.12k | £323.50k | £213.55k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £11.07m | £13.28m | £14.79m | £17.53m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.28m | £1.28m | £2.02m | £2.00m | £2.36m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £100.00k | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £8.25m | £10.01m | £6.52m | £6.68m | £9.42m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£183.00k | -£153.00k | -£45.79k | -£26.25k | -£13.96k | |
|
Total liabilities | £612.44k | £575.69k | £151.42k | £135.08k | £176.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 17 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/1966 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/11/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/07/2004 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26/05/2011 as amended on 15 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS”) ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND LITERACY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY CHARITABLE MEANS: (A) BY ESTABLISHING, PROVIDING AND CARRYING ON THE SERVICE OF PROCURING AND DISTRIBUTING READING AND INFORMATION MATERIAL REGARDLESS OF MEDIUM TO DEVELOPING AND OTHER COUNTRIES IN NEED FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES; (B) BY DISTRIBUTING CONSIGNMENTS OF SUCH MATERIAL TO PUBLIC AND COMMUNITY LIBRARIES, UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES, SCHOOLS, HOSPITALS, YOUTH AND CHILDREN'S CENTRES AND OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS ACCORDING TO THE LOCAL NEEDS AND PRIORITIES; AND (C) BY PROMOTING OR SUPPORTING ANY TRAINING OR OTHER ACTIVITY WHICH IS DESIGNED TO ENHANCE THE USE OF BOOKS, READING AND OTHER INFORMATION MATERIAL IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Book Aid International
2 Coldharbour Place
39-41 Coldharbour Lane
Camberwell
London
SE5 9NR
- Phone:
- 02077333577
- Email:
- alison.tweed@bookaid.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window