GILCHRIST EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity Number: 313877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE TRUST MAKES GRANTS TO: 1) ORGANISATIONS SEEKING TO FILL ACADEMIC EDUCATIONAL GAPS. 2) INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE EITHER WITHIN SIGHT OF THE END OF SELF-FINANCED DEGREE OR HIGHER EDUCATION COURSE AND WHO ARE FACING UNEXPECTED FINANCIAL DIFFICULTIES OR (B) REQUIRED, AS PART OF A UNIVERSITY COURSE , TO STUDY ABROAD. 3)EXPEDITIONS PROPOSING TO CARRY OUT SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024

Total income: £109,065
Total expenditure: £104,645

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 December 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLES EDWARD SAMUEL WHITBREAD Chair 27 April 2006
THE WIXAMTREE TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTHILL ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE ROWNEY TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ELSTOW ABBEY
Received: On time
Wild Life Foundation
Received: On time
SHANE WINSER Trustee 27 April 2016
None on record
PROFESSOR F L PEARCE Trustee 13 June 2002
None on record
Dr John Henry Hemming DLitt CMG Trustee 14 May 1985
ANGLO-PERUVIAN SOCIETY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £97.37k £77.67k £86.88k £152.34k £109.07k
Total expenditure £90.74k £72.82k £79.02k £89.17k £104.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 22 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 22 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 10 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 10 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2021 13 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 13 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 12 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 12 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Isabel Turner
The Bridge Workspace
7b Parkshot
Richmond
Surrey
TW9 2RD
Phone:
No information available