Accounts and annual returns THE ROBERT NICOL FELLOWSHIPS AND SCHOLARSHIPS

Charity number: 313881
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 February 2017 07 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2017 07 November 2017 On Time
Annual return 14 February 2016 12 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2016 12 December 2016 On Time
Annual return 14 February 2015 15 December 2015 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2015 Not Required
Annual return 14 February 2014 02 December 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 14 February 2014

(These accounts
have been qualified)

16 December 2014 2 days late