Financial history THE ROBERT NICOL FELLOWSHIPS AND SCHOLARSHIPS

Charity number: 313881
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 14/02/2013 14/02/2014 14/02/2015 14/02/2016 14/02/2017
Total gross income £27.21k £25.95k £24.73k £40.94k £33.65k
Total expenditure £21.69k £21.31k £22.26k £18.83k £25.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0