THE ROBERT NICOL FELLOWSHIPS AND SCHOLARSHIPS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was set up to advance and promote education in the City and County of Aberdeen, Scotland. Scholarships are awarded initially for one year to students usually over the age of 21 embarking on a course of study or research. To qualify for consideration, students must have been born in the City or County of Aberdeen or have resided there for a period of not less than 5 years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 February 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 October 1965: Standard registration
- 01 February 2018: Removed (Voluntary removal)
- THE ROBERT NICOL TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/02/2013 | 14/02/2014 | 14/02/2015 | 14/02/2016 | 14/02/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.21k | £25.95k | £24.73k | £40.94k | £33.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.69k | £21.31k | £22.26k | £18.83k | £25.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 February 2017 | 07 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2017 | 07 November 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 14 February 2016 | 12 December 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2016 | 12 December 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 14 February 2015 | 15 December 2015 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 February 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 14 February 2014 | 02 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
14 February 2014
(These accounts |
16 December 2014 | 2 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SETTLED IN THE CHANCERY OF THE COUNTY PALATINE OF LANCASTER DATED 21ST JANUARY 1949
Charitable objects
FELLOWSHIP AND SCHOLARSHIPS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN THE CITY AND COUNTY OF ABERDEEN.
Area of benefit
CITY AND COUNTY OF ABERDEEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window