WATERFORD SCHOOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The raising of funds in the UK for the promotion and encouragement of education at Waterford Kamhlaba United World College of Southern Africa which is located in Eswatini (previously known as Swaziland). The emphasis is on providing financial support to assist students, who are both able and disadvantaged, to attend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Eswatini
Governance
- 15 July 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT CREIGHTON | Chair | 18 October 1989 |
|
|
||||
DAN PILLAY | Trustee | 10 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mark Jennings | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA WEST | Trustee | 27 October 2004 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JARVIS | Trustee | 28 January 2003 |
|
|
||||
HARRY FIGOV | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.45k | £50.36k | £4.18k | £26.43k | £13.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.54k | £51.86k | £8.77k | £30.61k | £108.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 November 2021 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH JUNE 1962
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALL EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES INCLUDING PREMISES AND BURSARIES AT WATERFORD.
Area of benefit
WATERFORD SCHOOL, MBABANE, SWAZILAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 COLLEGE LANE
LONDON
NW5 1BJ
- Phone:
- 020 7485 5901
- Email:
- michael.jarvis.nw5@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window