THE DOCTOR DOROTHY JORDAN LLOYD MEMORIAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust makes travel grants to people who work in the leather industry or who are studying leather related subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 May 1961: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicholas Muirhead | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 23 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Loxston | Trustee | 06 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Michael Dodd | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|||||
MR JAMES LANG | Trustee |
|
||||||
GRAHAM LAMPARD PHD FSLTC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.73k | £5.68k | £6.60k | £7.07k | £7.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £500 | £500 | £10.55k | £3.31k | £2.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST FEBRUARY 1961 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 12TH OCTOBER 1962
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE STUDY OF AND EDUCATION IN LEATHER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY INCLUDING GRANTS TO STUDENTS AND SCIENTISTS FOR STUDY IN LEATHER SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY IN COUNTRIES OTHER THAN THEIR OWN.
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 71
LLANGOLLEN
Clwyd
LL20 9BP
- Phone:
- 07513412569
- Email:
- info@leatheruk.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window