COMMONWEALTH PRESS TRAINING AND EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Protection and promotion of press and media freedom throughout the Commonwealth, including the education and training of journalists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 October 1968: Standard registration
- CPTET (Working name)
- COMMONWEALTH JOURNALISTS TRAINING AND EDUCATION TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DIETER LORAINE | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORD BLACK OF BRENTWOOD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £896 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £220 | £360 | £360 | £7.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 OCTOBER 1968 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 10 NOVEMBER 1993 AND DEEDS OF VARIATION DATED 5 DECEMBER 2006 AND 7 OCTOBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN ANY VOCATION, SCIENCE, PROFESSION OR TRADE OF PERSONS ENGAGED OR WITH A VIEW TO THEIR BECOMING ENGAGED IN THE PRESS, THE MEDIA OR JOURNALISM IN THE BROADEST SENSE, INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THE AREAS OF PRINTING, PUBLISHING, PHOTOGRAPHY, INFORMATION AND COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGY, LAW BUSINESS MANAGEMENT, FINANCE, ADVERTISING, SALES AND DISTRIBUTION, ALL AS APPLICABLE TO THE PRESS, THE MEDIA OR JOURNALISM AND ANY OTHER EDUCATION OR TRAINING WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES IS RELEVANT TO THE PRESS, THE MEDIA OR JOURNALISM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 34
Cannon Court
5 Brewhouse Yard
LONDON
EC1V 4JQ
- Phone:
- 07802798849
- Email:
- info@societyofeditors.org
- Website:
-
cpu.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window