Accounts and annual returns THE JAWAHARLAL NEHRU MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 313976
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2016 31 July 2017 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2016 31 July 2017 63 days late
Annual return 05 April 2015 26 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 22 January 2016 On Time