Financial history THE JAWAHARLAL NEHRU MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 313976
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 29/07/2016
Total gross income £34.69k £48.67k £54.93k £54.10k £70.58k
Total expenditure £32.51k £44.44k £41.56k £43.32k £218.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0