THE JAWAHARLAL NEHRU MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 313976
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity awards scholarships to students of Indian citizenship who wish to specialise in science, technology or the humanities at a British University. A public lecture, known as the Jawaharlal Nehru Memorial Lecture, is also held annually in furtherance of education.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 29 July 2016

Total income: £70,580
Total expenditure: £218,088

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 January 1970: Standard registration
  • 24 April 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2012 05/04/2013 05/04/2014 05/04/2015 29/07/2016
Total gross income £34.69k £48.67k £54.93k £54.10k £70.58k
Total expenditure £32.51k £44.44k £41.56k £43.32k £218.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 29 July 2016 31 July 2017 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 July 2016 31 July 2017 63 days late
Annual return 05 April 2015 26 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2015 22 January 2016 On Time