Accounts and annual returns THE ARNOLD POWER BURSARY IN CONNECTION WITH THE NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HOUSECRAFT (EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING) LIMITED

Charity Number: 313993
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 12 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 13 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 25 January 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required