Financial history THE ARNOLD POWER BURSARY IN CONNECTION WITH THE NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HOUSECRAFT (EMPLOYMENT AND TRAINING) LIMITED
Charity Number: 313993
Removed charity
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £3.32k | £767 | £541 | £644 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.