Financial history THE CRANBURY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 314105
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £76.47k £76.22k £76.43k £76.78k £79.01k
Total expenditure £77.21k £77.33k £75.11k £63.16k £49.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A