Financial history KITCHENER MEMORIAL SCHOOL OF MEDICINE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 314142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.55k £1.28k £1.39k £1.36k £2.66k
Total expenditure £2.40k £22.19k £11.28k £2.01k £1.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A