THE ELIZABETH KOLB MEMORIAL TRUST ICW CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial grants for women studying at Cambridge University, England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 20 April 1965: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr DAVID ANTHONY LIVESEY | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY CATHOLIC ASSOCIATION | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR TIMOTHY SMILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER GLAZEBROOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £4.19k | £4.60k | £4.59k | £4.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.07k | £0 | £494 | £7.35k | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 24TH JANUARY 1958 PROVED AT PROBATE 1ST SEPTEMBER 1959
Charitable objects
ANNUAL GRANTS-IN-AID TO ASSIST WORTHY GIRLS OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC FAITH BORN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM ENGAGED IN ANY PARTICULAR COURSE OF STUDIES AND IN THEIR LIVING EXPENSES AT THE CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY, ENGLAND. PREFERENCE TO BE GIVEN TO ROMAN CATHOLIC GIRLS WHOSE PARENTS OR EITHER OF THEM WERE BORN IN THE JEWISH FAITH WHETHER OR NOT SUCH PARENTS SHALL HAVE REMAINED IN THE JEWISH FAITH.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
FISHER HOUSE
GUILDHALL STREET
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 3NH
- Phone:
- 01223742192
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window