THE LLOYD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants for any child over the age of 5 years of a father or mother who is a British Citizen and is in need of financial assistance to obtain British type education either overseas or in the UK whilst the family is living/working overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 23 October 1972: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pamela Rosemary Thomas | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Niaz Shams Alam | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Fitton CMG | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
SARAH BROUGHTON | Trustee | 07 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE MARIA SMART | Trustee | 01 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.91k | £165.73k | £170.70k | £188.92k | £185.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £181.53k | £234.92k | £169.26k | £122.39k | £115.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 01 OCT 2001 AS AMENDED ON 03 DEC 2015 as amended on 03 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF BENEFICIARIES IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING AWARDING TO BENEFICIARIES SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR OTHERWISE: (I) FOR STUDY AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT EITHER OVERSEAS OR IN THE UK APPROVED BY THE TRUSTEES; OR (II) FOR TRAVEL TO ADVANCE THEIR EDUCATION TO STUDY MUSIC OR OTHER ARTS OR TO UNDER TRAINING FOR ANY PROFESSION TRADE OR CALLING (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY AWARDING BURSARIES FOR STUDY AT ANY UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT TO TEACHING MEMBERS OF STAFF OF SCHOOLS OUTSIDE THE UK CONDUCTED IN ACCORDANCE WITH BRITISH EDUCATIONAL PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICE; (C) TO ASSIST ANY PERSON EMPLOYED BY THE FORMER ENGLISH SCHOOL CAIRO FOR AT LEAST FIVE YEARS OR AT THE TIME OF ITS CLOSURE AND WHO IS IN NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF A GRATUITY PENSION OR OTHER SUCH ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Milsted Langdon Llp
Winchester House
Deane Gate Avenue
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 2UH
- Phone:
- 07598444255
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window