Trustees THE HISPANIC AND LUSO BRAZILIAN COUNCIL
Charity Number: 314210

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cristobal Pollman | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Brennan | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carla Ferreira | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Clouder | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lourdes Casanova | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marcelo Scenna | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rodolfo Milesi | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ed Poulton | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gui Silva | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcial Echenique | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Vitoria Nabas | Trustee | 26 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas McCall | Trustee | 24 June 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.