Financial history THE CHARITY FUND OF THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF TIN PLATE WORKERS ALIAS WIRE WORKERS OF THE CITY OF LONDON

Charity number: 314211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £44.86k £28.60k £24.54k £29.28k £53.02k
Total expenditure £64.17k £95.45k £73.85k £79.26k £72.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A