Charity overview THE JOHN WILLIAM EMMOT SCHOLARSHIP FUND
Charity number: 529109-3
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH NOVEMBER 1940 AS VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 3RD OCTOBER 1963 AS AMENDED ON 26 JANUARY 1996 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
ONE HALF OF THE INCOME TO BE APPLIED IN SCHOLARSHIPS AWARDED TO PUPILS OF ERMYSTED'S GRAMMAR SCHOOL.THE OTHER HALF IN SCHOLARSHIPS AWARDED TO PUPILS OF THE GIRL'S HIGH SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 17 January 1964: Standard registration
- 29 October 1996: Removed
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.