Register of Charities - The Charity Commission CATHERINE MASON'S ENDOWMENT
Charity Number: 529569-2
Removed charity
Governing document
WILL PROVED 20TH JULY 1860.
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL DISTRICT OF SHAROW
Registration history
- 10 September 1965: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 October 2015: Re-registered
- 09 September 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.