Register of Charities - The Charity Commission BEXLEY AND SIDCUP LIONS CLUB POP IN PARLOUR CHARITY TRUST FUND
Charity number: 1006867-1
Removed charity
Governing document
LAST WILL OF LILLY ENA CROUCH WHO DIED ON 4TH MARCH 1989 AND THE SCHEME APPROVED AND ESTABLISHED BY ORDER OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS, WHICH ORDER WAS SEALED ON 26 NOVEMBER 1992.
Charitable objects
FOR IMPROVEMENTS TO OR THE ERECTION OF `POP-IN PARLOURS' FOR THE ELDERLY IN LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY'
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY
Registration history
- 16 March 1993: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 10 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 December 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 January 2012: Re-registered
- 25 January 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1189785 BEXLEY AND SIDCUP LIONS CLUB (CIO)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.