UNIPAL - A UNIVERSITIES' TRUST FOR EDUCATIONAL EXCHANGE WITH PALESTINIANS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Unipal seeks to promote cultural understanding between the British public and Palestinians living in refugee camps in West Bank, Gaza & Lebanon. We currently do this by running summer programmes that send volunteers to teach English in Palestinian refugee camps and by bringing UNRWA English teachers to the UK to attend language courses and thereby improve their English.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Israel
- Lebanon
Governance
- 26 February 1974: Standard registration
- 27 January 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1137322 UNIPAL
- UNIPAL (Working name)
- THE CAMBRIDGE FUND FOR THE EDUCATION OF PALESTINIAN REFUGEES (Previous name)
- THE UNIVERSITIES FUND FOR THE EDUCATION OF PALESTINIAN REFUGEES (Previous name)
- THE UNIVERSITIES' TRUST FOR EDUCATIONAL EXCHANGE WITH PALESTINIANS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.53k | £37.94k | £6.77k | £12.05k | £9.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.07k | £43.88k | £5.76k | £15.12k | £216 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 23 May 2015 | 112 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 19 May 2014 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 31 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH DECEMBER 1973 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 16TH DECEMBER 1975 AND 31ST DECEMBER 1995 AND 2ND OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SCIENCE AND THE ARTS AND IN THE PURSUIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LEAGUE OF NATIONS MANDATED TERRITORIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window