Financial history HOME FARM SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 325031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £14.65k £14.23k £11.57k £35.62k £36.52k
Total expenditure £6.30k £5.03k £10.05k £15.62k £17.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A