THE EDITH COOPER-DEAN FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Private educational facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Poole
Governance
- 08 April 1974: Standard registration
- UPLANDS SCHOOL (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzanne Johnston | Trustee | 22 July 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 04 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 4TH JULY 1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 14 MAY 2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS: (A) THE ESTABLISHMENT CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE AT PARKSTONE IN THE BOROUGH OF POOLE DORSET OF A SCHOOL FOR GIRLS AND BOYS IN WHICH SCHOOL THE SUBJECTS OF INSTRUCTION SHALL INCLUDE THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH. (B) INSOFAR AS THE ESTABLISHMENT CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL IN PARKSTONE CANNOT BE REASONABLY ACHIEVED THEN THE ESTABLISHMENT CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL ELSEWHERE IN POOLE OR BOURNEMOUTH. (C) IF THE ESTABLISHMENT CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL IN POOLE OR BOURNEMOUTH CANNOT BE REASONABLY ACHIEVED THEN THE ESTABLISHMENT CONDUCT AND MAINTENANCE OF A SCHOOL ELSEWHERE IN DORSET OR SUBJECT TO PARAGRAPH (D) HAMPSHIRE (D) PARAGRAPH (C) IS SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION IN THE EVENT A SCHOOL IN DORSET IS NO LONGER TO BE CONDUCTED OR MAINTAINED AND IN PLACE OF WHICH A SCHOOL IS TO ESTABLISHED CONDUCTED OR MAINTAINED IN HAMPSHIRE.
Area of benefit
POOLE, DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
United Church Schools Trust
Worldwide House
Thorpe Wood
PETERBOROUGH
PE3 6SB
- Phone:
- 01832864444
- Email:
- admin@unitedlearning.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window