Financial history ST THOMAS MORE SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 325080
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £39.60k £26.77k £33.26k £40.24k £41.45k
Total expenditure £37.71k £24.55k £29.05k £42.87k £41.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A