Governing document SCOLMA (THE UK LIBRARIES AND ARCHIVES GROUP ON AFRICA)
Charity number: 325086

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/05/1975 AS AMENDED 05/1985, 01/06/1990, 25/6/2006 AND 26/06/2012 AS AMENDED ON 07 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
2.1 THE AIMS OF THE ORGANISATION ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE ACQUISITION OF LIBRARY AND ARCHIVE MATERIALS INCLUDING ELECTRONIC RESOURCES NEEDED FOR AFRICAN STUDIES AND TO ASSIST IN AND ADVISE ON THE PROVISION, RECORDING AND USE OF SUCH MATERIALS IN PUBLIC, SPECIAL AND UNIVERSITY LIBRARIES AND ARCHIVES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.