JPMORGAN EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Funds of the JPMorgan Educational Trust support educational grantmaking of the JPMorgan Foundation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
- Scotland
Governance
- 30 August 1974: Standard registration
- 09 July 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JPMET (Working name)
- JPMORGAN FOUNDATIONS (Working name)
- GREAT ST HELEN'S EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- J.P. MORGAN FLEMING EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- SAVE AND PROSPER EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.00k | £31.00k | £24.93k | £7.00k | £3.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £88.00k | £27.00k | £4.92k | £116.00k | £50.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 01 May 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 02 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 20 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 07 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | 07 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7TH AUGUST 1974 (AMENDED NOVEMBER 1979) AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 4TH NOVEMBER 1974
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION GREAT BRITAIN A) BY MAKING DONATIONS OR SUBSCRIPTIONS TO CHARITABLE BODIES, SCHOOLS, UNIVERSITIES, COLLEGES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS WHICH PROMOTE EDUCATION IN GREAT BRITAIN; B) BY ASSISTING IN THE EDUCATION OF ANY PERSON IN GREAT BRITAIN; C) GENERALLY BY DOING SUCH THINGS AS MAY ADVANCE EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
GREAT BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window