Financial history THE STIMMATINI FATHERS TRUST

Charity Number: 326001
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £69.82k £72.26k £67.10k £72.51k £69.16k
Total expenditure £82.87k £83.44k £73.97k £74.98k £75.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A