THE GUARDIAN ROYAL EXCHANGE CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 January 1982: Standard registration
- 30 May 2006: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND DECEMBER 1981
Charitable objects
TO SUCH CHARITIES OR FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN SUCH PROPORTION IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR OWN ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window