BRITISH LYMPHOMA PATHOLOGY GROUP

Charity Number: 326023
Charity reporting is up to date (40 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organisation of educational activities to train and support medical professionals whose practice includes lymphoma pathology and related matters.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £22,709
Total expenditure: £29,514

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Liron Barnea Slonim Trustee 31 January 2025
None on record
Dr Hebah Ali Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Professor Maria Calaminici Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Dr Simon O'Connor Trustee 26 October 2020
None on record
Dr STEFAN DOJCINOV Trustee 04 September 2013
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £10.14k £12.13k £14.23k £22.37k £22.71k
Total expenditure £11.11k £4.11k £7.30k £21.93k £29.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 09 January 2025 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 05 December 2023 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2022 29 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 22 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 16 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Dept of Histopathology
Royal Marsden Hospital
Downs Road
SUTTON
SM2 5PT
Phone:
02089156548