MUSLIM STUDENTS HOUSE (MANCHESTER)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth training Youth education Women training Women education Social and cultural activities Wedding Conference and meeting facilities Advice and community services Sports activities Weekend children club Arabic courses for adults Media (community radio)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
Governance
- 19 February 1982: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BAHA BADER | Chair | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAAD ALMOGHRABI | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Muhamad Al-jahmi | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Osama Ahmad Chamoun | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.56k | £23.28k | £27.71k | £33.01k | £53.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.13k | £9.88k | £32.78k | £39.74k | £49.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.50k | £12.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2023
(These accounts |
30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JANUARY 1982.
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND RELIGION AMONG MUSLIMS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
272 Dickenson Road
Manchester
M13 0YL
- Phone:
- 01612252993
- Email:
- info@mshmanchester.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window