LESLIE AND DOROTHY BLOND AWARD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 March 1982: Standard registration
- BLOND TRUST (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
OLIVIA CAROL MARY BLOND | Trustee | 12 November 1993 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN LANE | Trustee | 29 February 1992 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA MAXINE LANE | Trustee | 11 July 1988 |
|
|
||||
MAXWELL BLOND | Trustee | 11 July 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.81k | £43.60k | £45.53k | £56.38k | £54.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.49k | £43.45k | £87.28k | £56.56k | £13.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 16 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19TH FEBRUARY 1982 AS AMENDED 29TH NOVEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH CONDUCT AND MAINTAIN ANNUAL SCHOLARSHIPS AND AWARDS WHERE THERE IS A CANDIDATE OF SUFFICIENT MERITS FOR THE PURPOSE OF ACKNOWLEDGING THE OUTSTANDING CONTRIBUTION OF A PERSON BORN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM IN THE FIELD OF SCIENCE EDUCATION AND THE ARTS SO AS TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE IT IN THEIR OWN PARTICULAR FIELD FURTHER RESEARCH OR SCHOLARSHIP AND TO EMPHASISE TO THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM GENERALLY AND IN A POSTIVE WAY THE REAL ACHEIVEMENTS OF THE PEOPLE LIVING THEREIN AND BY OFFERING THE INCENTIVE OF A SCHOLARSHIP OR AWARD EACH YEAR TO PROMOTE THE ARTISTIC, MENTAL AND CREATIVE DEVELOPMENT OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
1NITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 QUARRY ROAD EAST
HESWALL
WIRRAL
CH61 6XD
- Phone:
- 01513425846
- Email:
- blondtrust@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window