Accounts and annual returns MAURICE FREEDMAN RESEARCH TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 326077
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 23 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required