WATSIDE CHARITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 April 1982: Standard registration
- 04 September 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- JOHN WOODSIDE LIMITED (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £381 | £157 | |
|
Total expenditure | £53 | £17.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 07 August 2007 | 188 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 August 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 August 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 06 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 21 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31ST MARCH 1982 AND AMENDED 29TH JUNE 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17TH AUGUST 1982
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE IN SUCH MANNER AS THE FOUNDATION THINKS FIT SUCH PURPOSES BEING EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AS THE FOUNDATION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME SELECT INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORE GOING) BY THE APPLICATION OR PAYMENT OF MONEY TO ANOTHER CHARITY OR FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window