Financial history THE WOODSFORD TRUST

Charity Number: 326111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £13.26k £4.45k £5.95k £7.78k £8.70k
Total expenditure £20.96k £19.35k £20.44k £18.51k £19.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A