LORD SWINTON'S CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 326124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Make donations to other charitable institutions

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £4,109
Total expenditure: £1,520

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Bradford City
  • Calderdale
  • City Of Wakefield
  • Kirklees
  • Leeds City
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 May 1982: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark William Philip Cunliffe-Lister Trustee
ADMIRAL HARCOURT'S CHARITY
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
THE YORKSHIRE DALES MILLENNIUM TRUST
Received: On time
GLYN THOMAS Trustee
THE SIMON AND JANE SCROPE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.65k £2.74k £1.93k £3.63k £4.11k
Total expenditure £6.29k £5.51k £9.90k £1.16k £1.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 26 September 2024 234 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 05 April 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 10 March 2022 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 23 March 2021 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O Swinton Estate
Swinton Estate Office
Masham
Ripon
North Yorkshire
HG4 4JH
Phone:
01132314131
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available