THE CALEB CHRISTIAN AND MISSIONARY TRUST
Charity number: 326131
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
donations to Churches and Missionary organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
Total income: £4,592
Total expenditure: £4,774
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
- Birmingham City
- Dudley
- Hampshire
- Sandwell
- Solihull
Governance
Registration history:
- 04 June 1982: Standard registration
- 14 February 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- CALEB TRUST (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.63k | £4.11k | £4.50k | £4.29k | £4.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.42k | £4.42k | £4.32k | £4.30k | £4.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 May 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Submit annual return
Open in new window
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 APRIL 1982
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY SUPPORTING MISSIONARY SOCIETIES AND OTHER CHARITIES ASSOCIATED WITH THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window