THE YOUNG PERSONS CONCERT FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity, through its educational music workshops and concert programme, is the promotion of live music to young people in schools and in the community so as to build young audiences for the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 August 1982: Standard registration
- 01 February 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.36k | £16.74k | £12.33k | £605 | £2.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.11k | £32.68k | £28.37k | £19.27k | £5.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 April 2021 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21ST JUNE 1982 NO. 1645296
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVIE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN MUSIC AND OTHER PERFORMING ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS IN PARTICULAR AMONG THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO WOULD OTHERWISE BE DEPRIVED OF THE BENEFIT OF PERFORMANCE OF LIVE MUSIC AND OF OTHER PERFORMING ARTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window