THE CENTRE FOR BRAIN INJURY REHABILITATION AND DEVELOPMENT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
B.I.R.D aims to to improve activities of day to day living of children & adults with brain injuries & learning difficulties & their families through the physical and educational therapies it offers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £4,960 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
39 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 September 1982: Standard registration
- BIRD (Working name)
- THE B I R D CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracey Leigh Meadham | Chair | 17 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Carol Richards | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Gerard McGlown | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DICKINSON | Trustee | 25 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £239.42k | £188.77k | £186.64k | £163.17k | £158.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £251.65k | £213.57k | £157.03k | £174.97k | £167.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £18.40k | £32.44k | £11.43k | £19.18k | £4.96k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 AUGUST 1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 NOVEMBER 1996
Charitable objects
THE CENTRE IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF, TREATMENT AND ADVANCEMENT OF BRAIN INJURED PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
- No information available
- Phone:
- 01244 678629
- Email:
- admin@birdcharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window