Financial history THE CROSBY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £8.90k £9.39k £7.14k £4.96k £5.33k
Total expenditure £7.00k £900 £5.50k £5.00k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A