Accounts and annual returns THE ALLACHY TRUST
Charity number: 326237
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 June 2007 | 02 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2007 | 12 May 2008 | 38 days late | |
Annual return | 04 June 2006 | 11 April 2007 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2006 | 11 April 2007 | 7 days late | |
Annual return | 04 June 2005 | 30 August 2006 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2005 | 30 August 2006 | 148 days late | |
Annual return | 04 June 2004 | 18 August 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 June 2004 | 18 August 2004 | On Time |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window