THE INSTITUTE FOR COMPLEMENTARY MEDICINE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of safe Complementary Medicine to the general public by maintaining a register of qualified competent practitioners and lists of investigated courses of a good standard. Produces a monthly Journal and Website to inform the public. Involved in research and in the regulation of Complementary Medicine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 1983: Standard registration
- 30 November 2009: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 30 November 2009: Funds transferred to 1123644 INSTITUTE FOR COMPLEMENTARY AND NATURAL MEDICINE
- I C M (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 30/04/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.25k | £218.91k | £193.74k | £318.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.24k | £229.70k | £224.58k | £455.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2008 | 26 February 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2008 | 26 February 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 09 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 31 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 29 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 08 February 2007 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 09 February 2006 | 9 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 SEPTEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PRACTICE SUPPORT OR PROMOTION OF ALL NON-TOXIC METHODS OF HEALING AND NATURAL THERAPEURTIC DESIGNED TO RELIEVE HUMAN SUFFERING AND STRESS; RESEARCH INTO POSSIBLE MEANS OF IMPROVING SUCH NON-TOXIC METHODS OF HEALING AND NATURAL THERAPEUTICS AS ARE FROM TIME TO TIME IN USE PRESERVING OBJECTIVITY AND BALANCE IN THE METHOD OF CONDUCTING SUCH RESEARCH; AND PUBLICATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE INFORMATION AND EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITHOUT ANY ATTEMPT TO INFLUENCE POLITICAL ATTITUDES OR INCULCATE A PARTICULAR ATTITUDE OF MIND INT HE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window