Financial history THE TRINITY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 326327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.22k £984 £1.09k £1.22k £1.25k
Total expenditure £1.18k £1.40k £400 £1.78k £1.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A